CT HB05922 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Division of State Police and municipal police departments to annually compile a report of their records detailing certain incidents where a police officer uses force or discharges a weapon.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring Annual Reports On Use Of Force By State And Municipal Police Officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-03-12HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback