CT HB05945 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To study best practices of established public-private partnerships and make recommendations to create a framework for public-private partnerships to thrive in this state.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Regarding Public-private Partnerships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 395 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 248 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |