CT HB06004 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-12 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-12 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning Police Accountability.
Title
An Act Concerning Police Accountability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 52 PASS (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 52 PASS (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 23 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION HOUSE AMD A (Y: 72 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2020-07-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 24 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 86 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 52 PASS (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 23 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION HOUSE AMD A (Y: 72 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2020-07-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 24 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 86 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-12 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2020-08-07 | Senate | Public Act 20-1 |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor |
2020-07-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2020-07-23 | House | House Passed |
2020-07-23 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 3808 |
2020-07-23 | House | Emergency Certification |