CT HB06014 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Public Hearing 03/01
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Public Hearing 03/01
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the use of leghold and body-crushing traps.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Use Of Leghold And Body-crushing Traps.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Brenda Kupchick [R] | Rep. Fred Camillo [R] | Sen. Robert Duff [D] |
Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D] | Rep. Gail Lavielle [R] | Rep. Patricia Dillon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-02-20 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |