CT HB06040 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - File Number 571
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - File Number 571
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require owners of certain residential buildings to retain a home inspector and an engineer to prepare inspection reports concerning such buildings prior to transferring title to such buildings.
Title
An Act Requiring The Inspection Of Certain Residential Buildings By A Home Inspector And An Engineer Prior To The Transfer Of Title.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Geoffrey Luxenberg [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | File Number 571 |
2019-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 344 |
2019-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-03-22 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-13 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-02-06 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-02-06 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-01-31 | House | Change of Reference Planning and Development |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |