CT HB06048 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Public Hearing 03/25
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Public Hearing 03/25
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement several reforms concerning the integrity of election day registration procedures.
Title
An Act Concerning Integrity Of Election Day Registration.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Themis Klarides [R] | Rep. Vincent Candelora [R] | Rep. Tom O'Dea [R] |
Rep. Arthur O'Neill [R] | Rep. Noreen Kokoruda [R] | Rep. Lezlye Zupkus [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-03-19 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |