CT HB06063 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 679
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) no longer require an absentee ballot applicant to also return an original of a completed application if such applicant has already submitted a copy thereof to the town clerk by facsimile machine or other electronic means, (2) allow two or more immediate family members who are absentee ballot applicants to return their ballots in a single envelope, and (3) require the Secretary of the State, municipal clerks and registrars of voters to study various aspects of absentee voting to make it easier and minimize ballot rejections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Changes To The Process Of Voting By Absentee Ballot.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseFile Number 679
2019-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 415
2019-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-21HousePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-03-19HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-06HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback