CT HB06065 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Public Hearing 03/13
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Public Hearing 03/13
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow political parties to hold caucuses to determine nominees to run in special elections to fill state legislative vacancies.
Title
An Act Concerning Special Elections To Fill State Legislative Vacancies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |