CT HB06087 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 279
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 279
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit health insurers from discriminating against individuals on the basis of prior claims for naloxone hydrochloride.
Title
An Act Restricting The Use Of Prior Claims For Naloxone Hydrochloride.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | File Number 279 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 185 |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2019-03-07 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-07 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |