CT HB06111 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - File Number 628
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - File Number 628
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To adopt provisions of the Uniform Military and Overseas Voters Act.
Title
An Act Concerning The Uniform Military And Overseas Voters Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | File Number 628 |
2013-04-24 | House | House Calendar Number 416 |
2013-04-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2013-04-02 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2013-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |