CT HB06111 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 397
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 397
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow employers to control their costs of doing business by allowing them to automatically enroll their employees into direct paycheck deposit programs.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Automatic Direct Paycheck Deposit Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 397 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 250 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-02-26 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |