CT HB06120 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 680
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 680
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow (1) certain persons to file for property tax exemptions, notwithstanding certain statutory deadlines, and (2) the town of Woodbridge to renew certain temporary notes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Failure To File For Certain Grand List Exemptions And The Renewal Of Certain Temporary Notes Issued By A Municipality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 680 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 416 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-03-26 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-01-30 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |