CT HB06122 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To permit any municipality to incorporate into its municipal code, by ordinance, a special act concerning the establishment of a board of police commissioners and any amendment to such act.
Title
An Act Concerning Boards Of Police Commissioners Established By Special Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 413 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 191 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 191 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-24 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-24 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-20 | House | Public Act 19-104 |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Calendar Number 607 |
2019-05-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | File Number 337 |
2019-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 215 |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-02-27 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |