CT HB06146 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To expand certification courses in cardiopulmonary resuscitation for lifeguards and education and training courses in the use of automatic external defibrillators and the administration of first aid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Expansion Of Certification Courses In Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation And Education And Training Courses In The Use Of Automatic External Defibrillators And The Administration Of First Aid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 415 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 183 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-20HousePublic Act 19-105
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-24HouseFile Number 988
2019-05-24HouseSenate Calendar Number 609
2019-05-24HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-22HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-22HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9344
2019-04-09HouseFile Number 554
2019-04-09HouseHouse Calendar Number 336
2019-04-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-25HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-28HousePublic Hearing 03/04
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-02-20HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-08HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback