CT HB06173 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To expand eligibility for the Alzheimer's disease respite care program.
Title
An Act Expanding Eligibility For The Alzheimer's Disease Respite Care Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-07 | House | File Number 24 |
2019-03-07 | House | House Calendar Number 31 |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-26 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-05 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |