CT HB06174 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To raise the income level at which Social Security benefits may be deducted from state income tax and study whether the deductions decrease the numbers of taxpayers age sixty-two and older leaving the state.
Title
An Act Exempting Social Security Benefits From State Income Tax And Studying The Effect Of The Exemption On Taxpayer Migration Out Of State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-05 | House | File Number 14 |
2019-03-05 | House | House Calendar Number 25 |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-05 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |