CT HB06182 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Department of Children and Families to reimburse municipalities for costs associated with nonresident students the department places in the school districts of such municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Municipal Reimbursement For Costs Associated With Certain Nonresident Students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseChange of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseChange of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-13HouseChange of Reference Appropriations
2019-02-06HouseChange of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
2019-02-06HouseChange of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
2019-02-05HouseChange of Reference Planning and Development
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback