CT HB06283 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management to include in the annual inventories of state real property the number of state employees per square foot in buildings occupied by executive branch agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Utilization Of Buildings Occupied By Executive Branch Agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-03-18HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-03-06HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-11HousePublic Hearing 02/15
2019-02-06HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback