CT HB06356 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To provide municipalities with payment in lieu of taxes for state housing authority properties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Payments In Lieu Of Taxes For State Housing Authority Properties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-28HouseFile Number 182
2019-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 132
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Housing
2019-02-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-05HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-01HouseChange of Reference, Senate to Committee on Housing
2019-02-01HouseChange of Reference, House to Committee on Housing
2019-01-31HouseChange of Reference Housing
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback