CT HB06360 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Public Hearing 02/21
Pending: Joint Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Public Hearing 02/21
Pending: Joint Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish an annual tourism incentive grant program.
Title
An Act Establishing An Annual Tourism Incentive Grant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2019-02-01 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Commerce |
2019-02-01 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Commerce |
2019-01-30 | House | Change of Reference Commerce |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |