CT HB06364 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow ambulance services to transport a state or local law enforcement K9 to an emergency animal hospital when the law enforcement K9 is injured in the line of duty.
Title
An Act Concerning Emergency Transportation For State And Local Law Enforcement K9s.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. Brenda Kupchick [R] | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] | Rep. William Petit [R] |
Rep. Nicole Klarides-Ditria [R] | Rep. Michael Dimassa [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. John Hampton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | No Action |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-15 | House | File Number 653 |
2019-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 398 |
2019-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-03-25 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2019-02-08 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |