CT HB06368 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 400
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 400
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To reduce municipal costs for emergency medical services by allowing the administration of epinephrine without automatic prefilled cartridge injectors.
Title
An Act Allowing Emergency Medical Technicians To Administer Epinephrine Without The Use Of Automatic Prefilled Cartridge Injectors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 400 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 252 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-03-05 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-07 | House | Public Hearing 02/11 |
2019-02-01 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |