CT HB06384 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Senate Calendar Number 481
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow the Firefighters Cancer Relief Program to reimburse eligible firefighters for insurance deductibles and laboratory and diagnostic testing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Payment Of Insurance Deductibles And Laboratory And Diagnostic Testing Fees From The Firefighters Cancer Relief Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 85 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseSenate Calendar Number 481
2019-05-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-08HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 402
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 254
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-03-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback