CT HB06391 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Vote to Draft
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Vote to Draft
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To permit municipalities that employ a fire marshal or fire inspector to contract with qualified inspectors for the performance of any portion of an inspection required by state law.
Title
An Act Concerning The Performance Of Certain Inspections By Contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |