CT HB06404 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - File Number 118
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit the sale of flavored electronic cigarette liquid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting The Sale Of Flavored Electronic Cigarette Liquid Outside Of Retail Establishments That Prohibit The Entry Of Minors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseFile Number 118
2019-03-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 96
2019-03-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-08HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children
2019-03-05HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-21HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-05HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback