CT HB06472 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a personal income tax credit for graduates with a bachelor's degree, associate degree or advanced manufacturing certificate from a public or independent institution of higher education or private occupational school in the state.
Title
An Act Establishing A Tax Credit For Graduates Of Institutions Of Higher Education And Private Occupational Schools In The State.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Gary Turco [D] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Rep. John Hennessy [D] |
Rep. Kevin Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-04-02 | House | File Number 282 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 188 |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2019-03-08 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |