CT HB06530 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - File Number 961
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - File Number 961
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require that all state-owned or leased buildings contain at least one centrally located automatic external defibrillator and one person trained in the use of an automatic external defibrillator available in the event of an emergency.
Title
An Act Concerning The Presence Of Automated External Defibrillators In All State-owned Or Leased Buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 160 AS AMENDED (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | File Number 961 |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 576 |
2019-05-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8166 |
2019-05-14 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-14 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-10 | House | File Number 572 |
2019-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 345 |
2019-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-03-11 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2019-02-08 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |