CT HB06540 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-5-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To increase access to preventative and prophylactic interventions for minors who are at risk of exposure to the human immunodeficiency virus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Prevention Of The Human Immunodeficiency Virus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 353 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 51 AS AMENDED (Y: 121 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-20HousePublic Act 19-109
2019-06-05HouseIn Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-26HouseFile Number 819
2019-04-26HouseSenate Calendar Number 428
2019-04-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-24HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-24HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7452
2019-04-09HouseFile Number 556
2019-04-09HouseHouse Calendar Number 338
2019-04-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-25HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-03-19HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-03-01HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-20HousePublic Hearing 02/25
2019-02-08HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback