CT HB06575 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, in consultation with the Police Officer Standards and Training Council, to develop standards for active shooter response plans and assist municipalities, upon their request, in developing such plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Active Shooter Response Plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-03-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback