CT HB06578 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To organize the Connecticut Intelligence Center within the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection's Division of Emergency Management and Homeland Security.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut Intelligence Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2019-02-27 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |