CT HB06630 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 419
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 419
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require individuals who install solar energy systems to complete an electrician apprenticeship.
Title
An Act Requiring A Study Regarding Solar Electrical Contractor And Journeyman Licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 61 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 419 |
2019-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 473 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 298 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-14 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-02-07 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-02-07 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-02-05 | House | Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |