CT HB06637 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To enable Connecticut municipalities and the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection to prevent and respond to infestations of aquatic invasive species that negatively impact water quality, recreational use, environmental health and property values through a user-fee-based approach.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring An Invasive Species Stamp For The Operation Of A Motorboat On The Waters Of The State And Enforcement Of Noise Ordinances On Candlewood Lake.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 354 PASS (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 262 AS AMENDED (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-26SenatePublic Act 19-190
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-05SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 664
2019-06-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-01SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-01HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-01HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 10476
2019-06-01HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9130
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-03-28HouseFile Number 183
2019-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 133
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-08HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 03/01
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-02-20HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-11HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06637&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06637-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06637-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06637-R02-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06637-R03-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00190-R00HB-06637-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06637-R00ENV-CV45-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06637-R00ENV-CV78-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06637-R00FIN-CV139-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00262-R00HB06637-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00354-R00HB06637-SV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback