CT HB06646 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Public Hearing 03/18
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Public Hearing 03/18
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To utilize the Green Bank model for environmental infrastructure, including water and solid waste management, recycling, climate resiliency and natural resource conservation.
Title
An Act Establishing An Environmental Infrastructure Bank.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-03-11 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |