CT HB06714 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To provide cost-free telecommunications services for incarcerated persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Cost Of Telecommunications Services In Correctional Facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseBill Passed Temporarily
2019-05-28HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-28HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-28HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-28HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-23HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 776
2019-04-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 484
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-11HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-09HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-21HousePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-15HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-14HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-15HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback