CT HB06723 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require greater transparency concerning decisions made by the Board of Pardons and Paroles and to provide that a formerly incarcerated person and a crime victim be members of the board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Reform Of Parole Release And Revocation Practices And The Membership Of The Board Of Pardons And Paroles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 777
2019-04-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 485
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-11HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-09HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-29HousePublic Hearing 04/03
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-25HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-15HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback