CT HB06742 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File Number 1001
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Commissioner of Administrative Services, in conjunction with other state agency officials, to study and implement federal Executive Order 13627 for state contracting practices and to require the licensing of estheticians, nail technicians and eyelash technicians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Standards For The Inspection Of Salons And A Scope Of Practice Review For Estheticians, Nail Technicians And Eyelash Technicians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 211 AS AMENDED (Y: 115 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28HouseFile Number 1001
2019-05-28HouseSenate Calendar Number 627
2019-05-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-23HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-23HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9551
2019-05-22HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-22HouseNo New File by Committee on Public Health
2019-05-22HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-22HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-22HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-16HouseReferred by House to Committee on Public Health
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-17HouseFile Number 685
2019-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 421
2019-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-21HousePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-03-19HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-15HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-11HouseChange of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-02-11HouseChange of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-02-07HouseChange of Reference Government Administration and Elections
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06742&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06742-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06742-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06742-R02-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06742-R03-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06742-R04-HB.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06742-R00LAB-CV25-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06742-R00GAE-CV37-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06742-R00GAE-CV153-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06742-R00APP-CV87-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06742-R00PH-CV210-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00211-R00HB06742-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback