CT HB06754 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Office of Policy and Management to reimburse any municipality that purchased body-worn recording equipment during the fiscal years ending June 30, 2017, or June 30, 2018, and paid for such purchase not later than August 31, 2018, for costs associated with such purchase.
Title
An Act Concerning Reimbursement For The Purchase Of Body-worn Electronic Recording Equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 267 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 125 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 125 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-06 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-06 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-05 | House | Public Act 19-11 |
2019-05-30 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Calendar Number 510 |
2019-05-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-10 | House | File Number 574 |
2019-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 347 |
2019-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-03-22 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-06 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |