CT HB06775 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Education
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Education
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To connect certain students enrolled in public schools with certain available resources.
Title
An Act Concerning Military-connected Students And Public School Enrollment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Education |
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 184 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 134 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2019-03-07 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |