CT HB06869 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Vote to Draft
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Vote to Draft
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the remaining gift card balance necessary for a consumer to request a cash refund.
Title
An Act Concerning Cash Refunds Of Gift Card Balances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |