CT HB06874 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Public Hearing 03/13
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Public Hearing 03/13
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the State Treasurer to divest from any companies that hold the debt of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico due to the ongoing fiscal and humanitarian crisis on the island.
Title
An Act Concerning The Divestment Of State Funds From Companies That Hold Puerto Rican Debt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |