CT HB06887 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - File Number 864
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a task force to identify high-growth, high-demand jobs and analyze the implementation and creation of partnerships that provide apprenticeship opportunities for such jobs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Work-based Learning Opportunities In Industries With A Hiring Need In The State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 69 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseFile Number 864
2019-05-09HouseSenate Calendar Number 470
2019-05-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-07HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-07HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7510
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 283
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 189
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-02-27HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-07HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback