CT HB06890 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-8-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a task force to study the impact on students in the state of proposed federal changes to Title IX of the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1972.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring A Study Of The United States Department Of Education's Proposed Regulations Regarding Sexual Misconduct Under Title Ix Of The Elementary And Secondary Education Act Of 1972.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 417 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 199 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HouseSpecial Act 19-23
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-28HouseFile Number 1002
2019-05-28HouseSenate Calendar Number 617
2019-05-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-23HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-23HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9363
2019-04-01HouseFile Number 244
2019-04-01HouseHouse Calendar Number 162
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-01HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-03-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-31HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback