CT HB06891 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
Pending: Joint Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
Pending: Joint Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide a tax deduction from personal income tax for the payment of student loan interest.
Title
An Act Concerning A Deduction From The Personal Income Tax For Student Loan Interest.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Gregory Haddad [D] | Sen. Mae Flexer [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2019-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |