CT HB06916 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify the law regarding bad faith handling of workers' compensation claims.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Remedies And Potential Liability For Unreasonably Contested Or Delayed Workers' Compensation Claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 333 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 184 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 184 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-13 | House | Special Act 19-10 |
2019-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-24 | House | File Number 990 |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Calendar Number 605 |
2019-05-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-22 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9426 |
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 475 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 300 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-18 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |