CT HB06921 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit discrimination based on a person's criminal history.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Council On The Collateral Consequences Of A Criminal Record.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 411 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 175 AS AMENDED (Y: 108 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-142
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-05-24HouseFile Number 991
2019-05-24HouseSenate Calendar Number 595
2019-05-24HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-22HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-05-22HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 9352
2019-05-21HouseBill Passed Temporarily
2019-05-21HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8536
2019-05-15HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-15HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 476
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 301
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-22HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-21HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-03-18HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-03-05HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/26
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06921&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06921-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06921-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06921-R02-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06921-R03-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00142-R00HB-06921-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06921-R00LAB-CV28-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06921-R00LAB-CV84-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06921-R00LAB-CV160-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06921-R00APP-CV89-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00175-R00HB06921-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00411-R00HB06921-SV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback