CT HB06927 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force to study Connecticut's debarment procedures and how such procedures relate to other states and title 31 of the general statutes.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Debarment And Limitations On The Awarding Of State Contracts.
Sponsors
House Labor and Public Employees Committee | Rep. Robyn Porter [D] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. David Rutigliano [R] |
Rep. Joseph Zullo [R] | Rep. Joe Polletta [R] | Sen. Marilyn Moore [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 331 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 147 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 147 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-13 | House | Special Act 19-11 |
2019-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-20 | House | File Number 935 |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Calendar Number 537 |
2019-05-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-16 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8940 |
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 407 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 259 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-19 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |