CT HB06931 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 887
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To expand the application of various labor laws to domestic workers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Domestic Workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseFile Number 887
2019-05-16HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-16HouseNew File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-16HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-10HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/19 5:00 PM
2019-05-03HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-02HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-04-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 410
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 262
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-14HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-03-13HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-03-05HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback