CT HB06942 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To allow for a collaborative relationship between physician assistants and physicians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Collaborative Relationship Between Physician Assistants And Physicians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 422 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 220 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-144
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed
2019-05-30HouseSenate Calendar Number 637
2019-05-30HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-28HouseHouse Passed
2019-03-26HouseFile Number 142
2019-03-26HouseHouse Calendar Number 107
2019-03-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-26HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-08HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-13HouseVote to Hold Until Next Meeting
2019-01-31HousePublic Hearing 02/04
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback