CT HB06996 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the foreclosure mediation program until June 30, 2023.
Title
An Act Extending The Ezequiel Santiago Foreclosure Mediation Program Until June 30, 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 357 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 161 AS AMENDED (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 161 AS AMENDED (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | House | Public Act 19-145 |
2019-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-22 | House | File Number 962 |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 572 |
2019-05-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9106 |
2019-05-14 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-14 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-21 | House | File Number 85 |
2019-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 75 |
2019-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |