CT HB07000 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Commissioner of Children and Families to conduct a study to determine whether policy and procedural changes in the Department of Children and Families may increase the effectiveness of services provided to children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Training For Certain Public Safety And Emergency Services Personnel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 406 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 166 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-147
2019-06-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-22HouseFile Number 963
2019-05-22HouseSenate Calendar Number 578
2019-05-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-20HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-20HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9092
2019-03-25HouseFile Number 122
2019-03-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 100
2019-03-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-08HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-01HousePublic Hearing 02/07
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback